Global Patent Index - EP 0580469 B1

EP 0580469 B1 2000-04-26 - Plug connection set and seating especially for avionics

Title (en)

Plug connection set and seating especially for avionics

Title (de)

Steckverbindersatz und Befestigungsfläche insbesondere für die Avionik

Title (fr)

Ensemble de connexion à fiche et embase en particulier destiné à l'avionique

Publication

EP 0580469 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93401645 A

Priority

FR 9207956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2099717A1] The invention concerns a connector system comprising a plug having a first part comprising first signal contact members, a second part comprising first electrical power supply contact members and an intermediate part and a socket having a first part comprising second signal contact members, a second part comprising second electrical power supply contact members disposed to cooperate electrically with the first electrical power supply contact members and an intermediate part. The intermediate part of the plug has a first ground contact member and the intermediate part of the socket has a second ground contact member to cooperate electrically with the first member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/645; H01R 13/652

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/645 (2006.01); H01R 13/652 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/645 (2013.01); H01R 13/652 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2693042 A1 19931231; FR 2693042 B1 19961213; CA 2099717 A1 19931230; DE 69328461 D1 20000531; DE 69328461 T2 20000914; EP 0580469 A1 19940126; EP 0580469 B1 20000426; ES 2145766 T3 20000716; US 5397242 A 19950314

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130624

2013-07-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130624

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040626

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040626

2003-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: FCI

2003-04-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FCI

- Free text: FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL#TOUR FIAT, 1 PLACE DE LA COUPOLE, CEDEX 16#92084 PARIS LA DEFENSE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- FCI#53, RUE DE CHATEAUDUN#75009 PARIS (FR)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-07-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145766 T3

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328461 20000531

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

1995-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950920

1994-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940308

1994-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE