Global Patent Index - EP 0581636 B1

EP 0581636 B1 2000-05-10 - Flow rectifier for an expansion station and a metering device

Title (en)

Flow rectifier for an expansion station and a metering device

Title (de)

Stromverbesserer für eine Entspannungsstation und Messvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Redresseur de flux pour poste de detente et dispositif de comptage

Publication

EP 0581636 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93401809 A

Priority

FR 9209509 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0581636A1] Flow rectifier and expansion and metering station comprising such a flow rectifier. A main part (16) intended to be placed towards the upstream end has a surface with a symmetry of revolution about a central axis (A); this surface is generated by a curve with a re-entrant curvature with respect to the central axis (A), this curvature being almost zero, the curve being a straight line; the generating curve passes through a fixed point on the central axis (A); the rectifier is pierced with holes for the flow of the fluid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/10; E03B 7/07; F15D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03B 7/07 (2006.01); E03C 1/10 (2006.01); F15D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03B 7/09 (2013.01); E03B 7/072 (2013.01); F15D 1/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0581636 A1 19940202; EP 0581636 B1 20000510; DE 69328592 D1 20000615; FR 2694345 A1 19940204; FR 2694345 B1 19941007

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-03-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-11-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-11 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-08-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328592 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2000-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

1997-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970715

1994-09-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940725

1994-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT