Global Patent Index - EP 0581895 B1

EP 0581895 B1 2000-01-05 - PARTICULATE DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

PARTICULATE DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG TEILCHENFÖRMIGER WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE DETERGENTS PARTICULAIRES

Publication

EP 0581895 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92913595 A

Priority

  • GB 9108639 A
  • US 9203286 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9218594A1] Particulate compositions are provided incorporating from about 10 % to about 95 % by weight of a crystalline layered silicate material of the formula Na MSixO2x+1 <yH>2<O>, where M is sodium or hydrogen, x is a number from about 1.9 to 4 and y is a number from 0 to about 20 and from about 5 % to about 90 % by weight of a solid water soluble ionisable material selected from organic acids, organic and inorganic acid salts and mixture thereof, said solid water soluble ionisable material naming a mean particle size not greater than about 100 micrometers, said particulate compositions being substantially free of unbound moisture. The particulates can optionally contain up to about 50 % by weight of a surfactant and/or up to about 50 % by weight of other detergent ingredients. Fully formulated detergent compositions incorporating the particulate compositions are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/08; C11D 3/06; C11D 3/10; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/16; C11D 3/20; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/16 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/2075 (2013.01); C11D 3/2082 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0253323 A2 19880120 - HENKEL KGAA [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9218594 A1 19921029; AR 245212 A1 19931230; AT 188504 T 20000115; AU 2183992 A 19921117; AU 666316 B2 19960208; BR 9205925 A 19940705; CA 2108906 A1 19921024; CA 2108906 C 19980623; CN 1037453 C 19980218; CN 1067069 A 19921216; DE 69230531 D1 20000210; EP 0581895 A1 19940209; EP 0581895 A4 19950426; EP 0581895 B1 20000105; FI 934677 A0 19931022; FI 934677 A 19931022; GB 9108639 D0 19910612; HU 9303013 D0 19940328; IE 921286 A1 19921104; IN 185539 B 20010224; JP 2999263 B2 20000117; JP H06507197 A 19940811; MA 22511 A1 19921231; MX 9201885 A 19930101; NO 933800 A 19931221; NO 933800 D0 19931022; NZ 242425 A 19950726; PT 100420 A 19930831; PT 100420 B 19990630; SK 114193 A3 19940406

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-05-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20120420

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1013102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000421

2000-04-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-04-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230531 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-01-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188504 T 20000115

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980112

1995-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19950308

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1994-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931022

1994-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE