Global Patent Index - EP 0582089 B1

EP 0582089 B1 2000-01-26 - Device and method for the careful packaging of a product

Title (en)

Device and method for the careful packaging of a product

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum schonenden Abfüllen eines Produktes

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour emballer un produit avec précaution

Publication

EP 0582089 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93110638 A

Priority

DE 4222062 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0582089A1] A device for the careful packaging of a product, the consistency of which can be influenced by external influences and which consists of a plurality of constituents separable from one another, has a conveying stage (6), on which the product is conveyed. At least one bar (12-15, 12'-15') mounted displaceably in its longitudinal direction extends through the conveying stage. In a position moved into the conveying stage, this bar extends with its longitudinal axis transversely to the conveying stage, the cross-section of which is at least partially opened in a position of the bar moved out of the conveying stage. The conveying stage (6) extends through a container (5) from its inlet orifice to its outlet orifice (23). It possesses a descending gradient conveying the product as a result of its own weight. A number of bars dividing the cross-section into a number of free portions of predetermined size extends through the cross-section. The number of bars extending through the cross-section can be controlled in dependence on the desired size of free portions in synchronism or in a successive timing frequency. At least some bars are displaceable in succession in a time sequence. In the associated method, the product conveyed on a conveying stage (6) is loosened. A changing number of bars (12-15, 12'-15') longitudinally displaceable into the conveying stage are displaced each time, thereby releasing the product constituents, previously retained by this number, at the conveying stage, whilst the other number respectively remain for the same length of time in their position within the conveying stage. The product located in a container (5) is loosened before it emerges from the container in a lower outlet orifice (23). A changing number of bars (12-15, 12'-15') arranged next to and behind one another in the region of the outlet orifice and longitudinally displaceable in front of the outlet orifice (23) on the container side are displaced away in front of the outlet orifice each time, thereby releasing the product constituents previously retained by this number, whilst the other number respectively remain for the same length of time in their position in front of the outlet orifice (23). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 37/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0582089 A1 19940209; EP 0582089 B1 20000126; DE 4222062 A1 19940105; US 5411171 A 19950502

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-02-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LIEDER MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20000731

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DK FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

1995-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950124

1994-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941019

1994-05-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1994-03-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DK FR GB IT NL

1994-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE