Global Patent Index - EP 0582646 B1

EP 0582646 B1 2000-08-23 - ELECTRONIC BOOK

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC BOOK

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES BUCH

Title (fr)

LIVRE ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 0582646 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92911059 A

Priority

  • US 68527891 A
  • US 9203056 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9218964A1] An electronic book apparatus that comprises multiple pages (122) with printed information (126), visual signal means (125) for identifying the printed information in a sequentially organized manner, synchronized audio signal means (154) for describing and further identifying the information concurrently with the visual signal means, and switching means (127) for electronically controlling the generation and transmission of these signals when each particular page is opened for viewing. Each page of the electronic book includes a laminated sheet (124), on which the printed material is arranged, and an electronic backdrop (121) containing the visual signal means for display through the laminated sheet. Separaate intelligent electronic means (160) in the spine (140) and top portion (150) of the book, coupled to the switching means, activate the illuminating circuitry and a voice synthesizer (168) that are synchronized and sequenced to produce a concurrent visual and audio enhancement of the printed matter being viewed on the page. The apparatus controls the presentation in a predetermined seqence deemed appropriate to enhance comprehension of the material and, if desired, provide entertainment. In one embodiment of the invention, the user is provided at each page with alternative options to repeat certain sequences or continue through the book.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09B 5/00; G09B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09B 5/00 (2006.01); G09B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/123 (2013.01); B42D 1/006 (2013.01); B42D 1/009 (2013.01); G09B 5/062 (2013.01); G09B 5/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9218964 A1 19921029; AT 195827 T 20000915; AU 1784192 A 19921117; AU 664701 B2 19951130; CA 2108554 A1 19921016; DE 69231383 D1 20000928; EP 0582646 A1 19940216; EP 0582646 A4 19950531; EP 0582646 B1 20000823; JP H06509654 A 19941027; MX 9205737 A 19931029; US 5167508 A 19921201; US 5417575 A 19950523

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010414

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010414

2001-04-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010414

2001-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-01-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-11-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231383 20000928

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE

2000-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195827 T 20000915

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUTECH INTERACTIVE PRODUCTS, INC.

1999-08-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCTAGGART, STEPHEN, I.

1997-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961220

1995-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19950413

1995-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE

1994-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931115

1994-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE