Global patent index - EP 0582676 B1

EP 0582676 B1 2000-03-22 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO RAZOR BLADES

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO RAZOR BLADES

Title (de)

RASIERKLINGE

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT LES LAMES DE RASOIR

Publication

EP 0582676 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92913377 A

Priority

  • US 9203330 W
  • US 69201091 A
  • US 75981291 A
  • US 83525192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9219425A2] A razor blade includes a substrate with a wedge-shaped edge, an interlayer of material selected from the group consisting of nickel, niobium, silicon, silicon carbide, tantalum, vanadium, and alloys of such materials on the tip and flanks of the wedge-shaped edge, the thickness of the interlayer preferably being in the range of about 50-500 angstroms, and a layer of diamond or diamond-like carbon material on the interlayer that preferably has a thickness of about two thousand angstroms and that defines a tip radius of less than about 1000 angstroms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/54; B26B 21/40; B26B 21/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 15/40 (2006.01); B26B 21/00 (2006.01); B26B 21/14 (2006.01); B26B 21/40 (2006.01); B26B 21/54 (2006.01); B26B 21/56 (2006.01); B26B 21/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/60 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • US 4933058 A 19900612 - BACHE ROGER J [GB], et al
  • DATABASE WPI Week 8945, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A44, Page 4, AN 89328714

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9219425 A2 19921112; WO 9219425 A3 19930121; AT 190892 T 20000415; AU 2184292 A 19921221; AU 666659 B2 19960222; CA 2102222 A1 19921027; CA 2102222 C 19980825; CN 1039527 C 19980819; CN 1068058 A 19930120; CZ 288085 B6 20010411; CZ 9302275 A3 19940316; DE 69230822 D1 20000427; DE 69230822 T2 20001207; EG 19582 A 19990531; EP 0582676 A1 19940216; EP 0582676 A4 19940706; EP 0582676 B1 20000322; ES 2143473 T3 20000516; HU T69255 A 19950828; JP 3439761 B2 20030825; JP H06507100 A 19940811; KR 100241239 B1 20000302; MX 9201910 A 19921101; RU 2108234 C1 19980410; TR 26981 A 19940912; TW 221976 B 19940401

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120423

2013-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130724

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120421

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-05-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20120421

2012-04-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69230822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143473

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69230822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-04-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000422

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190892

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1995-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950322

1994-07-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1994-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1994-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19931118

1994-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE