Global Patent Index - EP 0582993 B1

EP 0582993 B1 2001-05-09 - Accumulator fuel injection apparatus

Title (en)

Accumulator fuel injection apparatus

Title (de)

Speicherkraftstoffeinspritzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de carburant avec accumulateur

Publication

EP 0582993 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93112796 A

Priority

JP 21408092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0582993A1] An accumulator fuel injection apparatus (100) in which a nozzle element (5) is divided into a first nozzle body (11) having a one end side of said nozzle element (5) and a second nozzle body (12) having the other end side of the nozzle element (5). The accumulator fuel injection apparatus (100) comprises a stopper (45) for setting a maximum movement position of the first nozzle body (11) toward the second nozzle body (11), a second pressure control chamber (50) communicating with a first pressure control chamber (15) and forming a predetermined space or interval through which the first nozzle body (11) and the second nozzle body (12) are spaced away from each other under a condition that the first nozzle body (11) is arranged at the maximum movement position, and delay means (29,35) for delaying reduction of pressure within the first pressure control chamber (15) due to the fact that fluid flows into a low-pressure chamber from the first pressure control chamber (15) upon communication of the first pressure control chamber (15) and the low-pressure chamber with each other. It is possible to easily perform operation of setting an amount of pre-lift of the nozzle needle which decides an injection rate, and operation of assembling constitutional elements thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 45/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/083 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0582993 A1 19940216; EP 0582993 B1 20010509; DE 69330195 D1 20010613; DE 69330195 T2 20011018; JP H0666219 A 19940308

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69330195

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100810

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090805

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69330195 20010613

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DENSO CORPORATION

1996-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960604

1994-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940211

1994-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT