Global Patent Index - EP 0583787 B1

EP 0583787 B1 2000-03-22 - Silver halide photographic material

Title (en)

Silver halide photographic material

Title (de)

Photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent

Publication

EP 0583787 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93113287 A

Priority

JP 22153892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0583787A2] A photographic material which exhibits excellent dynamic properties and little curl is provided. The silver halide photographic material comprises at least one light-sensitive layer on a polyester support, wherein the polyester support is a polyester support having a glass transition temperature of 90 DEG C to 200 DEG C and is subject to glow discharge treatment. The polyester support is preferably subjected to post heat treatment at a temperature ranging from 50 DEG C to lower than the glass transition temperature of said polyester support after the glow discharge treatment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/795; G03C 1/91

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/795 (2006.01); G03C 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/915 (2013.01); G03C 1/7954 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0581120 A1 19940202 - FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0583787 A2 19940223; EP 0583787 A3 19950920; EP 0583787 B1 20000322; DE 69328144 D1 20000427; DE 69328144 T2 20000720

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090819

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080905

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328144 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-02-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980721

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951215

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1994-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL