EP 0586177 A3 19950816 - COPYING OR PRINTING PROCESS AND APPARATUS
Title (en)
COPYING OR PRINTING PROCESS AND APPARATUS
Publication
Application
Priority
US 93757292 A 19920831
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0586177A2] A method and apparatus for printing or copying text and/or graphics on a support medium in a removable manner to facilitate alterations. The method comprising: creating a toned image, corresponding to the text and/or graphics on a support medium, wherein the image receiving side of the support medium prior to receiving the toned image is blank or contains extraneous markings; and fixing the toned image to the support medium by setting a fusing condition efficacious to removably fix the toned image, thereby rendering the first toned image removably fixed on the support medium. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 13/20 (2006.01); G03G 15/20 (2006.01); G03G 15/22 (2006.01); G03G 15/36 (2006.01); G03G 21/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G03G 13/20 (2013.01); G03G 21/00 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 015 (P - 1298) 14 January 1992 (1992-01-14)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 089 (P - 836) 2 March 1989 (1989-03-02)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 247 (P - 490) 26 August 1986 (1986-08-26)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0586177 A2 19940309; EP 0586177 A3 19950816; JP H0695552 A 19940408
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 93306696 A 19930824; JP 14772993 A 19930618