Global patent index - EP 0587238 B1

EP 0587238 B1 2000-07-19 - High-pressure discharge lamp

Title (en)

High-pressure discharge lamp

Title (de)

Hochdruckentladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge à haute pression

Publication

EP 0587238 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93202553 A

Priority

  • EP 93202553 A
  • EP 92202712 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0587238A1] A high-pressure discharge lamp of the invention comprises a ceramic discharge vessel (10) in which a first and a second electrode (40a, 40b) are arranged and which encloses a discharge space (11) which is provided with a filling containing a metal halide. The discharge vessel (10) has a central zone (20) between the electrodes (40a, 40b) and a first and a second cylindrical end zone (30a, 30b) which each surround a current supply conductor (50a, 50b) is connected to a respective electrode (40a, 40b). At least the first end zone (30a) has a diameter smaller than the smallest diameter of the central zone (20). The current supply conductor (50a) through the first end zone (30a) has a halide resistant portion (51a) which faces the discharge space (11) and a portion (52a) permeable to hydrogen and oxygen and facing away from the discharge space (11). The halide resistant portion (51a) extends through the first end zone (30a) over a distance that is at least the inner diameter D of the first end zone (30a) augmented by 2 mm. Furthermore, the current supply conductor (50b) through the second end zone (30b) has a halide resistant portion (51b) which faces the discharge space (11). The construction allows for a sufficient reduction of the amount of hydrogen and oxygen in the discharge vessel (10), while corrosive attack of the current supply conductors (50a, 50b) by halides is prevented. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/366 (2013.01); H01J 61/363 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0587238 A1 19940316; EP 0587238 B1 20000719

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140925

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130831

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE *PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-09-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130831

2013-09-11 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-09-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69329046

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121001

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150433

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329046

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1996-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19951214

1994-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940825

1994-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1994-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL