Global Patent Index - EP 0587529 B1

EP 0587529 B1 2000-05-03 - Protection device

Title (en)

Protection device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abschirmung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection

Publication

EP 0587529 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93810594 A

Priority

  • CH 269592 A
  • US 96305592 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0587529A2] The device has a plurality of support bars which can be spread apart radially from a central head part (2) and a plurality of shielding surface elements (17, 18) which are attached in each case between two support bars. The multi-part design of the support bars from bar elements (4, 5), which engage in one another in a longitudinally displaceable manner, permits surface elements (17, 18) to slide over one another so that the device can have different sizes of the protective surface during use, starting from a compact, pushed-together and collapsed form. The shielding can be adjusted individually by sliding limitedly transparent surface elements over one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 25/18; A45B 19/06; A45B 23/00; A45B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 11/00 (2006.01); A45B 17/00 (2006.01); A45B 19/06 (2006.01); A45B 23/00 (2006.01); A45B 25/14 (2006.01); A45B 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/14 (2013.01); A45B 19/06 (2013.01); A45B 23/00 (2013.01); A45B 25/18 (2013.01); A45B 11/00 (2013.01); A45B 2011/005 (2013.01); A45B 2023/0012 (2013.01); A45B 2023/0025 (2013.01); A45B 2025/186 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0587529 A2 19940316; EP 0587529 A3 19941221; EP 0587529 B1 20000503; BR 9303611 A 19941129; CA 2105139 A1 19940301; JP 2622346 B2 19970618; JP H06217813 A 19940809; JP H0767712 A 19950314; US 5398710 A 19950321; US 5551465 A 19960903

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: STEINER WALTER

- Effective date: 20000831

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-11-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310024 20000608

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192289 T 20000515

1997-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970312

1995-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950621

1994-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1994-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE