Global Patent Index - EP 0588187 B2

EP 0588187 B2 2001-04-11 - Partition for fairs or shops

Title (en)

Partition for fairs or shops

Title (de)

Messe- und Ladenbauwand

Title (fr)

Cloison d'aménagement pour foires ou magasins

Publication

EP 0588187 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93114196 A

Priority

DE 4230949 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0588187A2] A wall for fairs and shops exhibits two profile struts (2) which run parallel to, and at a distance from, one another and contain, in their narrow longitudinal sides, grooves (13) behind which it is possible to engage. Hooked in the lower profile strut are at least two carrying members (17) on which one wall panel (3) stands. The wall panel (3) is prevented from tilting by an upper retaining member (18). Both the carrying member (17) and the retaining member (18) have, with respect to the cross-section, a U-shaped configuration, formed in each case from a rear part and two legs extending from the rear part. One of the legs is plugged into the groove (13), behind which it is possible to engage, of the relevant profile strut (2), whereas the other leg engages in a groove (16) of the wall panel (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74; A47B 96/04; A47F 5/08; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/04 (2006.01); A47F 5/08 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0006 (2013.01); A47B 96/04 (2013.01); A47F 5/0807 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

EP 0358612 A1 19900314 - FOCCHI GIUSEPPE DI FOCCHI UGO [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0588187 A2 19940323; EP 0588187 A3 19941228; EP 0588187 B1 19970618; EP 0588187 B2 20010411; AT 154656 T 19970715; DE 4230949 C1 19940324; US 5414971 A 19950516

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59306777

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-09-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1998-03-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OCTANORM-VERTRIEBS-GMBH FUER BAUELEMENTE

- Effective date: 19980127

1997-12-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-11-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

1997-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970930

1997-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970930

1997-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970904

1997-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59306777 19970724

1997-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-06-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-06-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-06-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-06-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 154656 T 19970715

1996-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960201

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950608

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1994-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI