Global Patent Index - EP 0590315 B1

EP 0590315 B1 2001-12-19 - Heater, especially for kitchen appliances

Title (en)

Heater, especially for kitchen appliances

Title (de)

Heizer, insbesondere für Küchengeräte

Title (fr)

Elément chauffant, en particulier pour appareils de cuisine

Publication

EP 0590315 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93113723 A

Priority

DE 4229375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5498853A] At least one radiant heating resistor (10) formed from a corrugated flat material band has in different orientations projections (28) projecting from a corrugated longitudinal edge (14), which on the one hand for retaining purposes engage in an insulation (3) and on the other hand form longitudinal portions (39) with a slightly lower electrical resistance and which for the conventional operating power appear dark compared with the intermediate, visibly glowing longitudinal portions (38). Thus, on putting into operation, there is a very rapidly starting, punctiform lighting up of the corresponding longitudinal portions (38), which then spreads out to a wavy line, as well as a very reliable anchoring of the heating resistor (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74; H05B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/04 (2006.01); H05B 3/06 (2006.01); H05B 3/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/748 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5498853 A 19960312; AT 211348 T 20020115; AU 4605393 A 19940310; AU 5616696 A 19960829; AU 667563 B2 19960328; AU 692708 B2 19980611; CN 1091581 A 19940831; CN 1130953 C 20031210; DE 4229375 A1 19940310; DE 4229375 C2 20000504; EP 0590315 A2 19940406; EP 0590315 A3 19941228; EP 0590315 B1 20011219; ES 2170061 T3 20020801; JP 2003303663 A 20031024; JP 3458904 B2 20031020; JP H06229564 A 19940816; SI 9300457 A 19940331; SI 9300457 B 20031231; TR 27591 A 19950613; TW 321820 B 19971201; ZA 9306467 B 19940322

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-11-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131108

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59310253

2013-08-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59310253

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110827

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110827

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110827

2012-04-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-03-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100827

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH

- Free text: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH# #75038 OBERDERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH# #75038 OBERDERDINGEN (DE)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170061 T3

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310253 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211348 T 20020115

1997-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961216

1997-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH

1995-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941209

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

1994-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETE BLANC UND FISCHER GMBH & CO

1994-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI SE