Global Patent Index - EP 0590867 B9

EP 0590867 B9 2002-12-18 - Ship propulsion arrangement

Title (en)

Ship propulsion arrangement

Title (de)

Schiffsantriebsanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de propulsion marine

Publication

EP 0590867 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 93307501 A

Priority

FI 924334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0590867A1] A main propulsion unit (1) of a high power ship or other large marine vessel (21) comprises an outer casing (1a) said unit having a tubular shaft (8) turnable about an axis substantially normal to the water surface, and comprising an outer casing (1a) which communicates with the tubular shaft and defines an internal space containing an electrical drive motor (2) and a propeller shaft (3) connected to at least one propeller (4) external of the outer casing (1a). The outer casing (1a) of the unit (1) is, on its inside, supported by a plurality of web plates (5), which are arranged to act, simultaneously, as structural elements stiffening and supporting the outer casing (1a), as elements securing the drive motor (2) in place and transmitting to the casing (1a) reaction forces to the torque developed by the drive motor (2) and acting as wall elements of ducts for incoming and outgoing gaseous coolant for the drive motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 5/125; B63H 23/24; B63H 25/42; H02K 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 20/00 (2006.01); B63H 5/125 (2006.01); B63H 20/32 (2006.01); B63H 23/24 (2006.01); B63H 25/42 (2006.01); H02K 5/20 (2006.01); H02K 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 5/20 (2013.01); B63H 5/125 (2013.01); B63H 21/383 (2013.01); B63J 2/12 (2013.01); H02K 9/12 (2013.01); B63H 23/24 (2013.01); B63H 2005/1258 (2013.01); B63H 2023/346 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0590867 A1 19940406; EP 0590867 B1 19960424; EP 0590867 B2 20020502; EP 0590867 B9 20021218; CA 2107202 A1 19940329; CA 2107202 C 20030527; DE 69302348 D1 19960530; DE 69302348 T2 19960926; DE 69302348 T3 20030306; DK 0590867 T3 19960812; DK 0590867 T4 20020826; ES 2087662 T3 19960716; ES 2087662 T5 20021116; FI 924334 A0 19920928; FI 924334 A 19940329; FI 96590 B 19960415; JP 3394965 B2 20030407; JP H06191484 A 19940712; NO 319557 B1 20050829; NO 933441 A 19940329; NO 933441 D0 19930927; RU 2097266 C1 19971127; SG 43165 A1 19971017; US 5403216 A 19950404

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130923

2013-12-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131205

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130921

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130924

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130921

2013-10-02 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20130922

2013-09-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69302348

2013-09-23 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-10-11 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-08-26 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2002-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2002-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROLLS-ROYCE AB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH * 19970117 ROLLS-ROYCE A

- Effective date: 19961221

2000-05-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2000-05-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ABB AZIPOD OY

2000-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

2000-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KAMEWA AB

2000-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH * 19970117 KAMEWA AB

- Effective date: 19961221

1999-08-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABB AZIPOD OY

1999-08-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

1997-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

1997-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KAMEWA AB

1997-03-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

- Effective date: 19961221

1997-03-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KAMEWA AB

- Effective date: 19970117

1997-02-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

- Effective date: 19961221

1996-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-08-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1996-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2087662 T3

1996-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

1996-06-21 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2087662 T3

1996-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69302348 19960530

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1995-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950619

1994-10-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940826

1994-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE