Global Patent Index - EP 0591934 B1

EP 0591934 B1 2001-01-03 - Photographic processing composition and processing method

Title (en)

Photographic processing composition and processing method

Title (de)

Photographische Verarbeitungszusammensetzung und photographisches Verarbeitungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Composition et méthode de traitement photographique

Publication

EP 0591934 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93116104 A

Priority

JP 26596392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0591934A1] A novel photographic processing composition is provided, comprising at least one of compounds represented by the following general formula (I) or salts thereof: <CHEM> wherein R1 represents a carboxyl, aliphatic or aromatic group; R2 and R3 each represents a carboxyl, phosphono, sulfo or hydroxyl group; L1, L2, L3 and L4 each represents an alkylene group; X represents a hydrogen atom, aliphatic group or aromatic group; M represents a hydrogen atom or cation; and m and n each represents an integer 0 to 3. A novel method for the processing of a silver halide photographic material is also provided, which comprises the processing of a silver halide photographic material which has been imagewise exposed to light with a processing solution containing at least one of the compounds represented by the general formula (I) as defined above or salts thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/305; G03C 5/26; G03C 5/38; G03C 7/30; G03C 7/413; G03C 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 3/00 (2006.01); G03C 5/26 (2006.01); G03C 5/29 (2006.01); G03C 5/305 (2006.01); G03C 5/38 (2006.01); G03C 7/30 (2006.01); G03C 7/407 (2006.01); G03C 7/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/3046 (2013.01); G03C 5/26 (2013.01); G03C 5/3053 (2013.01); G03C 5/38 (2013.01); G03C 7/407 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0591934 A1 19940413; EP 0591934 B1 20010103; DE 69329814 D1 20010208; DE 69329814 T2 20010426; JP 2819487 B2 19981030; JP H06118580 A 19940428

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091005

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329814 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-01-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970905

1994-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940610

1994-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL