Global patent index - EP 0592506 B2

EP 0592506 B2 2000-01-26 - PLASTIC CLOSURE FOR CONTAINERS WITH TAMPER INDICATING ELEMENT

Title (en)

PLASTIC CLOSURE FOR CONTAINERS WITH TAMPER INDICATING ELEMENT

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFF-VERSCHLUSS FÜR BEHÄLTER MIT ORIGINALITÄTSSICHERUNGSELEMENT

Title (fr)

FERMETURE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE POUR RECIPIENTS COMPORTANT UN ELEMENT INDICATEUR DE TENTATIVE D'OUVERTURE

Publication

EP 0592506 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92913766 A

Priority

  • DE 4121618 A
  • DE 4121619 A
  • EP 9201434 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0521389A1] A plastic closure for containers is proposed which has a closure panel (3), a shell (5) starting from said closure panel, and a tamper-proof region which is provided in the edge region (7) of the shell, is constructed as a tamper-proof ring (9) and is provided with at least one vertical incision (29) extending over the height of the tamper-proof region. The closure is distinguished by the fact that the arrangement of the vertical incision (29) depends on particular shape features, preferably on the arrangement of the holding webs (15) of the closure (1), and said vertical incision is cut into the wall (27) of the tamper-proof ring (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26F 1/18 (2006.01); B65D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2013.01); B26F 1/18 (2013.01); B65D 41/3423 (2013.01); B65D 41/3428 (2013.01); B26F 2210/04 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0046 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0521389 A1 19930107; AT 152416 T 19970515; AU 2173492 A 19930125; AU 665770 B2 19960118; BR 9206223 A 19941122; CA 2112565 A1 19930107; CA 2112565 C 20020827; DE 59208436 D1 19970605; DK 0592506 T3 19971103; DK 0592506 T4 20000626; EP 0592506 A1 19940420; EP 0592506 B1 19970502; EP 0592506 B2 20000126; ES 2104935 T3 19971016; ES 2104935 T5 20000616; FI 935894 A0 19931228; FI 935894 A 19931228; JP H06508587 A 19940929; KR 100220787 B1 19990915; MX 9203718 A 19940531; NO 307211 B1 20000228; NO 934182 A 19931119; NO 934182 D0 19931119; WO 9300270 A1 19930107

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050627

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050625

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2005-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2005-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2004-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040607

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040517

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-06-26 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2000-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-05-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-04-14 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-03-22 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-02-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-01-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free Format Text: VERBUNDEN MIT 92110700.9/0521389 (EUROPAEISCHE ANMELDENUMMER/VEROEFFENTLICHUNGSNUMMER) DURCH ENTSCHEIDUNG VOM 22.07.94.

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CROWN CORK AG

1998-03-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CROWN CORK AG

- Effective date: 19980127

1997-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALCOA DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. VERPACKUNGSWERKE

- Effective date: 19970630

1997-11-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

1997-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2104935

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1997-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970805

1997-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

1997-08-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 19970814

1997-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19970630

1997-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970625

1997-06-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970625

1997-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59208436

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 19970605

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1997-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

1997-05-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970502

1997-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 152416

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 19970515

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1997-05-02 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free Format Text: VERBUNDEN MIT 92110700.9/0521389 (EUROPAEISCHE ANMELDENUMMER/VEROEFFENTLICHUNGSNUMMER) DURCH ENTSCHEIDUNG VOM 22.07.94.

1994-10-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940914

1994-09-07 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free Format Text: VERBUNDEN MIT 92110700.9/0521389 (EUROPAEISCHE ANMELDENUMMER/VEROEFFENTLICHUNGSNUMMER) DURCH ENTSCHEIDUNG VOM 22.07.94.

1994-06-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

1994-04-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931109

1994-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE