Global Patent Index - EP 0593040 B1

EP 0593040 B1 2000-03-22 - Liquid jet recording head and liquid jet recording apparatus

Title (en)

Liquid jet recording head and liquid jet recording apparatus

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitstrahlaufzeichnungskopf und Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Tête d'enregistrement par jet de liquide et appareil

Publication

EP 0593040 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93116573 A

Priority

JP 27708192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0593040A2] A heater board(1) having a plurality of energy generating elements disposed thereon to discharge recording liquid droplets therefrom is adhesively secured to a base plate(5). A plurality of ink flow paths are formed on a solid layer(8) deposited on the heater board(1). In addition, a ceiling plate(2) having a common liquid chamber communicated with the ink flow paths is mounted on the solid layer(8), and the ceiling plate(2) is thrusted against the solid layer by the resilient force of a comb-shaped retaining leaf spring(7). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1632 (2013.01); B41J 2/14024 (2013.01); B41J 2/1604 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1626 (2013.01); B41J 2/1634 (2013.01); B41J 2/1637 (2013.01); B41J 2202/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0593040 A2 19940420; EP 0593040 A3 19950927; EP 0593040 B1 20000322; DE 69328150 D1 20000427; DE 69328150 T2 20000921; JP 3190454 B2 20010723; JP H06126943 A 19940510

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328150 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961001

1996-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960212

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT