EP 0594480 A1 19940427 - Speech detection method.
Title (en)
Speech detection method.
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Erkennung von Sprachsignalen.
Title (fr)
Procédé de détection de la parole.
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 9212582 A 19921021
Abstract (en)
The method of the invention consists in: - detecting a voiced frame; - searching for the noise frames preceding this voiced frame; - constructing an auto-regressive model of the noise and a mean noise spectrum; - whitening the frames preceding the voicing; - searching for the actual start of speech in the whitened frames; - ridding the voiced frames of noise and parametrising them; and - searching for the actual end of speech.
Abstract (fr)
Le procédé de l'invention consiste à : détecter une trame voisée ; rechercher des trames de bruit précédant cette trame voisée ; construire un modèle auto-régressif du bruit et un spectre moyen de bruit ; blanchir les trames précédant le voisement ; rechercher le début effectif de la parole dans les trames blanchies ; débruiter les trames voisées et les paramétriser ; et rechercher la fin effective de la parole.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G10L 11/00 (2006.01); G10L 11/02 (2006.01); G10L 15/04 (2006.01); G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 21/02 (2006.01); G10L 25/93 (2013.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G10L 25/87 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 25/27 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 2025/932 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 2025/937 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 4959865 A 19900925 - STETTINER YORAM [IL], et al
- [A] EP 0335521 A1 19891004 - BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]
- [A] EP 0459363 A1 19911204 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
- [A] E.S. DERMATAS ET AL.: "Fast endpoint detection algorithm for isolated word recognition in office environment", ICASSP 91, vol. 1, 14 May 1991 (1991-05-14), TORONTO, pages 733 - 736, XP000245333, DOI: doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1991.150444
- [A] M. CHUNG ET AL.: "Word boundary detection and speech recognition of noisy speech by means of iterative noise cancellation techniques", ICASSP 85, vol. 4, 26 March 1985 (1985-03-26), TAMPA FLORIDA, pages 1838, XP002034470
- [A] S.F. BOLL: "Suppression of acoustic noise in speech using spectral subtraction", IEEE TRANS. ON ASSP, vol. 27, no. 2, April 1979 (1979-04-01), pages 113 - 120, XP000572856, DOI: doi:10.1109/TASSP.1979.1163209
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0594480 A1 19940427; EP 0594480 B1 19990818; DE 69326044 D1 19990923; DE 69326044 T2 20000706; FR 2697101 A1 19940422; FR 2697101 B1 19941125; JP H06222789 A 19940812; US 5572623 A 19961105
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 93402522 A 19931013; DE 69326044 T 19931013; FR 9212582 A 19921021; JP 28560893 A 19931021; US 13974093 A 19931021