Global Patent Index - EP 0594495 B1

EP 0594495 B1 2001-01-03 - Driving aid method and device by reception and processing of traffic information

Title (en)

Driving aid method and device by reception and processing of traffic information

Title (de)

Fahrhilfeverfahren und -vorrichtung durch Empfang und Auswertung von Verkehrsnachrichten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'assistance à la conduite par réception et exploitation d'informations routières

Publication

EP 0594495 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93402564 A

Priority

FR 9212609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0594495A1] Method for assistance with driving for a motor vehicle, based on receiving road information by a radio channel, as well interpretation of it in real time by the driver, characterised, on the one hand, in that the latter simultaneously monitors the choice of a route or of a predefined geographical area and listens to or consults information relating to this route or to this area, and, on the other hand, in that he continuously controls the interpretation, simultaneous or otherwise, of other modes of communication and the corresponding use of common reproduction units. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); G08G 1/0967 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/55 (2013.01); G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0594495 A1 19940427; EP 0594495 B1 20010103; DE 69329815 D1 20010208; DE 69329815 T2 20010503; FR 2697363 A1 19940429; FR 2697363 B1 19941125

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-29 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2003-06-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-06-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20030203

2002-10-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329815 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970806

1994-11-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940929

1994-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE