Global Patent Index - EP 0594820 B1

EP 0594820 B1 2000-01-19 - ARRANGEMENT FOR MANUFACTURING PHARMACEUTICAL AND/OR COSMETIC OINTMENTS DIRECTLY IN A DISPENSER

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT FOR MANUFACTURING PHARMACEUTICAL AND/OR COSMETIC OINTMENTS DIRECTLY IN A DISPENSER

Title (de)

ANORDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN UND/ODER KOSMETISCHEN SALBEN OD. DGL. DIREKT IM AUSGABEGEFÄSS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR LA PRODUCTION DE POMMADES PHARMACEUTIQUES ET/OU COSMETIQUES OU ANALOGUES DIRECTEMENT DANS LE DISTRIBUTEUR

Publication

EP 0594820 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93909978 A

Priority

  • DE 4216252 A
  • EP 9301194 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4216252A1] A screw container (1) is suitable as a dispenser of pharmaceutical and/or cosmetic ointments, pastes, creams, gels, emulsions or the like produced with a stirrer, with or without the admixture of solid components. The dispenser can also be used as a mixing vessel when prescription mixtures are produced. The screw cap (26) that can be screwed on an outer thread (8) of the body of the container has a closable central opening (30) through which the driving shaft for the stirring tool of a stirrer (56) can extend.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01); B01F 11/00 (2006.01); B01F 13/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/42 (2006.01); B65D 51/32 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 11/0054 (2013.01); B01F 13/002 (2013.01); B01F 13/0035 (2013.01); B01F 7/00 (2013.01); B01F 15/00506 (2013.01); Y10S 215/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9323156 A1 19931125; AT 188887 T 20000215; DE 4216252 A1 19931118; DE 4216252 C2 19940526; DE 9321387 U1 19971211; EP 0594820 A1 19940504; EP 0594820 B1 20000119; ES 2145048 T3 20000701; GR 3033283 T3 20000929; JP 3405542 B2 20030512; JP H06509263 A 19941020; PT 594820 E 20000731; US 5397178 A 19950314

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120513

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130514

2013-08-30 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000400968

- Effective date: 20130514

2013-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-07-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130725

2013-05-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *KONIETZKO ALBRECHT

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-05-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120513

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120513

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120513

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 188887 T

- Effective date: 20120513

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-11-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20121113

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110505

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070514

2008-02-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145048 T3

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000513

2000-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188887 T 20000215

1999-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 01F 7/22 A

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT FOR MANUFACTURING PHARMACEUTICAL AND/OR COSMETIC OINTMENTS DIRECTLY IN A DISPENSER

1999-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 01F 7/22 A

1999-06-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT FOR MANUFACTURING PHARMACEUTICAL AND/OR COSMETIC OINTMENTS DIRECTLY IN A DISPENSER

1995-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950208

1994-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940504

1994-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE