Global Patent Index - EP 0595514 B1

EP 0595514 B1 2003-06-25 - Piezoelectric transducer

Title (en)

Piezoelectric transducer

Title (de)

Piezoelektrischer Wandler

Title (fr)

Transducteur piézo-électrique

Publication

EP 0595514 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93308246 A

Priority

  • JP 8035792 U
  • JP 8313892 U
  • JP 8430392 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0595514A2] The case has an opening and a wall section with a hole provided on the wall section and the wall section forms an inner space. The case also has a recessed area surrounding the hole. The piezoelectric diaphragm is supported around its periphery on top of the case so that an enclosure, including the hole, is formed within the inner space. An acoustic resistance sheet is bonded on to the wall section with the adhesive that is filled into the recessed area to close off the hole. With this structure, defective damping caused by seeping of the adhesive is prevented. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 17/00; H04R 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/03 (2006.01); H04R 17/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/03 (2013.01); H04R 17/00 (2013.01); H04R 1/222 (2013.01); H04R 1/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0595514 A2 19940504; EP 0595514 A3 19961009; EP 0595514 B1 20030625; CN 1037396 C 19980211; CN 1086368 A 19940504; DE 69333058 D1 20030731; DE 69333058 T2 20031224; US 5371428 A 19941206

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071015

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071015

2006-10-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69333058 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1994-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940530

1994-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB