Global Patent Index - EP 0596817 B1

EP 0596817 B1 2000-04-05 - Process and apparatus for surface treating metallic cans particularly made of aluminium or its alloys

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for surface treating metallic cans particularly made of aluminium or its alloys

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Oberflächenbehandlung von Metalldosen, insbesondere aus Aluminium oder dessen Liegierungen

Title (fr)

Méthode, dispositif et appareil de traitement de surface de corps de boites métalliques, en particulier en A1 ou ses alliages

Publication

EP 0596817 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93420438 A

Priority

FR 9213437 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0596817A1] Method, device and apparatus for surface treatment, such as a coating and/or a cleaning of bodies of metal cans, preferably made of Al and its alloys, more particularly of bodies of cans obtained by deep drawing, drawing-deep drawing or impact extrusion. The device according to the invention comprises at least the following components: a) a nozzle (23) of electrically conductive material such as graphite or stainless steel, pierced with an axial channel, substantially vertical in direction, on which a can body to be treated can be arranged upside down, b) guiding means (6) permitting an easy displacement of the can body in a substantially vertical direction, c) an electrode (11) forming an electrical contact and situated above the bottom of the can body. The method consists in conveying a basket containing the cans from an (electrolytic) cleaning station to a rinsing station and then to an (electrophoretic) coating station and finally to a rinsing station. The invention finds its application in the packaging industry. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 13/14; C25D 13/12; C25D 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23G 3/00 (2006.01); C25D 13/00 (2006.01); C25D 13/14 (2006.01); C25D 13/20 (2006.01); C25F 1/00 (2006.01); C25F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 13/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0596817 A1 19940511; EP 0596817 B1 20000405; CA 2102248 A1 19940504; CA 2102248 C 19990608; CN 1087958 A 19940615; DE 69328280 D1 20000511; DE 69328280 T2 20001102; ES 2146605 T3 20000816; FR 2697539 A1 19940506; FR 2697539 B1 19941202; JP 2664861 B2 19971022; JP H06235093 A 19940823; US 5435899 A 19950725

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051102

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146605 T3

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328280 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-04-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000405

1996-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951205

1994-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940606

1994-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE