Global patent index - EP 0598656 B1

EP 0598656 B1 2001-03-14 - Radiating element for an antenna array and sub-set with such elements

Title (en)

Radiating element for an antenna array and sub-set with such elements

Title (de)

Elementarstrahler für Gruppenantenne und solche Strahler enthaltende Baugruppe

Title (fr)

Source élémentaire rayonnante pour antenne réseau et sous-ensemble rayonnant comportant de telles sources

Publication

EP 0598656 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93402777 A

Priority

FR 9213744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0598656A1] The invention relates to a wideband radiating element for an antenna array, using microstrip technology. According to the invention, a patch (2) etched on a dielectric substrate (1) is placed at the bottom of a cavity (7) defined by conducting walls (8) which are, for example, cylindrical or of more complicated geometry. According to variants, the conducting wall (8) can pass through the dielectric substrate (1) in order to form an electrical contact with the earth plane (6); or a second resonator, which consists of a second patch (12) etched on a second thin dielectric substrate (11) may be placed in front of the cavity (7). The invention also deals with radiating sub-arrays produced from several of these radiating elements, as well as with antenna arrays produced from several of these sub-arrays. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/18 (2006.01); H01Q 21/06 (2006.01); H01Q 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/18 (2013.01); H01Q 21/065 (2013.01); H01Q 21/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0598656 A1 19940525; EP 0598656 B1 20010314; DE 69330020 D1 20010419; DE 69330020 T2 20011011; FR 2698212 A1 19940520; FR 2698212 B1 19941230; US 5434581 A 19950718

INPADOC legal status

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131115

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131119

2013-12-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20131115

2013-11-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69330020

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121116

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-08-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69330020

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL SPACE INDUSTRIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960612

1994-11-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940914

1994-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE