Global patent index - EP 0599049 B1

EP 0599049 B1 2000-04-12 - Use of carbon microfibres

Title (en)

Use of carbon microfibres

Title (de)

Verwendung von Mikro-Carbonfasern

Title (fr)

Utilisation de microfibres de carbone

Publication

EP 0599049 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93116853 A

Priority

DE 4239532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0599049A2] The invention relates to the use of carbon microfibres for the non-destructive testing of the electro conductivity of the substrate of microstructured bodies, in which microstructure elements of electrically nonconducting material rise out of an electrically conducting substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 1/067

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/04 (2006.01); H01R 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/04 (2013.01); H01R 11/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4239532 C1 19940210; AT 191794 T 20000415; EP 0599049 A2 19940601; EP 0599049 A3 19950816; EP 0599049 B1 20000412

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2003-10-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031017

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-06-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-06-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-10-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310006

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-18

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191794

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990716

1995-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950708

1995-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1995-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1994-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL