Global Patent Index - EP 0600003 B1

EP 0600003 B1 2000-03-29 - METHOD FOR TEMPERATURE-COMPENSATING ZENER DIODES HAVING EITHER POSITIVE OR NEGATIVE TEMPERATURE COEFFICIENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TEMPERATURE-COMPENSATING ZENER DIODES HAVING EITHER POSITIVE OR NEGATIVE TEMPERATURE COEFFICIENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR TEMPERATURKOMPENSATION VON ZENERDIODEN MIT ENTWEDER POSITIVEN ODER NEGATIVEN TEMPERATURKOEFFIZIENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION DE LA TEMPERATURE DE DIODES ZENER PRESENTANT DES COEFFICIENTS DE TEMPERATURE SOIT POSITIFS SOIT NEGATIFS

Publication

EP 0600003 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92918698 A

Priority

  • US 9207039 W
  • US 74808791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9304423A1] An auto-TC voltage reference (Vo) wherein an operational amplifier (20) receives at one input (22) the voltage of a Zener diode (24) and at its other input (38) receives a compensation signal from a feedback circuit (30A) comprising a transistor (Q4) and resistor network (40). When one of the resistors of the network is trimmed to give a nominal output voltage for the reference, the TC of the reference voltage will have been reduced to zero, or nearly so. The circuitry is capable of compensating Zener diodes of either positive or negative TC.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/20; G05F 1/46; G05F 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/56 (2006.01); G05F 1/46 (2006.01); G05F 1/567 (2006.01); G05F 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/463 (2013.01); G05F 1/567 (2013.01); G05F 3/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9304423 A1 19930304; DE 69230856 D1 20000504; DE 69230856 T2 20001109; EP 0600003 A1 19940608; EP 0600003 A4 19941102; EP 0600003 B1 20000329; JP H06510149 A 19941110

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120819

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120821

2012-09-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20120819

2012-08-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69230856

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230856 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960823

1994-11-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19940915

1994-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1994-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940321

1994-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB