Global Patent Index - EP 0600297 B1

EP 0600297 B1 2000-03-22 - Multicolor embroidery machine

Title (en)

Multicolor embroidery machine

Title (de)

Mehrfarben-Stickmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à broder multicolore

Publication

EP 0600297 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93118493 A

Priority

JP 33975292 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0600297A2] A multicolor embroidery machine exchangeably uses different color threads to make embroidery on cloth. The different color threads are fed from a plurality of thread supplies to a selection device (10). The selection device selects one of the threads (20). Only the selected thread is transported by means of an air flow to a needle for stitching and then stitched on the cloth. The selection device (10) transports by means of an air flow one of a plurality of threads respectively fed to a plurality of inlets (33), to an outlet (34), and then feeds out the thread therefrom by means of an air flow. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 11/16; B65H 51/16; B65H 51/20; D05B 49/04; D05B 87/00; D05C 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 45/00 (2006.01); B65H 51/16 (2006.01); B65H 51/20 (2006.01); B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D05B 49/04 (2006.01); D05B 87/00 (2006.01); D05C 11/08 (2006.01); D05C 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/16 (2013.01); B65H 51/16 (2013.01); B65H 51/205 (2013.01); B65H 51/22 (2013.01); B65H 57/003 (2013.01); D05B 49/04 (2013.01); D05B 87/00 (2013.01); D05C 11/08 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01); D05D 2207/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0600297 A2 19940608; EP 0600297 A3 19941130; EP 0600297 B1 20000322; CN 1040566 C 19981104; CN 1091167 A 19940824; DE 69328153 D1 20000427; DE 69328153 T2 20001214; JP H06154453 A 19940603; TW 224499 B 19940601

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091116

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328153 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1997-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961119

1995-01-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941117

1994-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT