Global Patent Index - EP 0601686 B1

EP 0601686 B1 2000-04-26 - Adjustable shelf assembly, in particular for refrigerators

Title (en)

Adjustable shelf assembly, in particular for refrigerators

Title (de)

Einstellbares Regalsystem, insbesondere für Kühlschränke

Title (fr)

Etagère ajustable, en particulier pour réfrigérateurs

Publication

EP 0601686 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93304982 A

Priority

US 98908792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0601686A2] Adjustable refrigerator shelving includes a shelf rail (20) for supporting a partial width shelf (26) within a refrigerated compartment having spaced shelf tracks (22) vertically oriented within the compartment. The tracks (22) releasably engage with a number of support brackets for cantilevered support of one or more shelves at a plurality of vertically spaced locations. The shelf rail (20) is adapted for releasable engagement with the shelf tracks and is interposed between the partial shelf (26) and the shelf tracks for horizontally adjustable support of the partial shelf. The shelf rail includes rearwardly projecting hooks (42,44) at each of two opposing ends for releasable engagement with the shelf tracks. Locking tabs (44) may be included on the hooks to retain the shelf rail on the tracks, while a rub strip (72) is provided along a top edge of the shelf rail, between the partial shelf and the shelf rail. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/02; F25D 11/00; F25D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/42 (2006.01); A47B 96/06 (2006.01); F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/02 (2013.01); A47B 57/42 (2013.01); A47B 96/061 (2013.01); F25D 2325/022 (2013.01); F25D 2331/803 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0601686 A2 19940615; EP 0601686 A3 19970312; EP 0601686 B1 20000426; CA 2097221 A1 19940612; CA 2097221 C 20000222; DE 69328470 D1 20000531; DE 69328470 T2 20000914; ES 2144444 T3 20000616; MX 9303471 A 19940630

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-09-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130905

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130624

2013-07-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130624

2013-06-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69328470

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144444 T3

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328470 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-08-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ADJUSTABLE SHELF ASSEMBLY, IN PARTICULAR FOR REFRIGERATORS

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980507

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-03-05 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 23/02

1996-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEMTRON CORPORATION

1995-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DONNELLY TECHNOLOGY, INC.

1994-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE