Global Patent Index - EP 0601721 B1

EP 0601721 B1 2000-01-05 - Process for preparing overbased phenates

Title (en)

Process for preparing overbased phenates

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von überbasischen Phenolaten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le préparation de phénates surbasiques

Publication

EP 0601721 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93309190 A

Priority

US 98745192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0601721A2] Overbased sulfurized alkaline earth metal alkylphenate having excellent water tolerance properties in lubricant formulations is prepared by charging into a reactor a preheated (280-380 DEG F) mixture of alkaline earth metal base and alkylphenol (preferably in oil), while simultaneously, but separately, charging a promoter solvent such as a glycol. Then a controlled amount of molten sulfur is charged at a rate that controls the reaction exotherm and off-gas evolution, while maintaining the 280-380 DEG F temperature. Upon completing the sulfur charge, the reactor contents are allowed to interact at 280-380 DEG F long enough to form the sulfurized alkylphenate. While keeping the temperature at 280-380 DEG F, the sulfurized alkylphenate is overbased by charging the reactor simultaneously with controlled amounts of alkaline earth metal base, promoter solvent, and carbon dioxide gas, at a controlled charge rate not much greater or less than the rate at which the reactants undergo reaction to form the overbased phenate. Upon completing the charging of the alkaline earth metal base and promoter solvent, the carbon dioxide charge is continued until completion of the carbonation reaction. Unreacted alkylphenol and promoter solvent are stripped off under vacuum with inert gas purge at 400-480 DEG F, and the resultant reaction product is filtered and the filtered product recovered. The reaction cycle time is no more than about 6 hours, and the filtered product has water tolerance properties normally associated with a batch preparation of the same product requiring a reaction cycle time of at least 8 hours.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 159/22; C07G 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 319/14 (2006.01); C07C 323/20 (2006.01); C10M 159/22 (2006.01); C10M 177/00 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01); C10N 70/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 159/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0601721 A2 19940615; EP 0601721 A3 19950208; EP 0601721 B1 20000105; CA 2109758 A1 19940608; DE 69327515 D1 20000210; DE 69327515 T2 20000621; JP 3513771 B2 20040331; JP H07150180 A 19950613

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AFTON CHEMICAL CORP.

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051118

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-05-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2004-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-12-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69327515 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1998-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980126

1995-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950731

1995-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1994-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB