Global Patent Index - EP 0602431 B1

EP 0602431 B1 2000-02-02 - Ductor blade arrangement

Title (en)

Ductor blade arrangement

Title (de)

Rakelanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de racle d'essuyage

Publication

EP 0602431 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93119115 A

Priority

DE 4242582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0602431A1] To reduce the stoppage times of a rotary intaglio printing machine and the amount of waste occurring, provision is made in a doctor blade arrangement, in which a doctor blade extending parallel to the axis of rotation of the forme cylinder (1) is pressed against the forme cylinder with the aid of a doctor blade beam (25) to scrape off the excess ink, for the doctor blade to be formed by a strip (20) which is so flexible that it can be wound and unwound around axes running transversely to its longitudinal direction, for the doctor blade strip to be mounted and guided on the doctor blade beam in such a way that it is displaceable counter to and in the longitudinal direction, for the length of the doctor blade strip to be far greater than the axial length of the forme cylinder, and for a winding device (28, 29) to be arranged in each case in the region of the axial ends of the forme cylinder for winding and unwinding the doctor blade strip. Using a drive device, the doctor blade strip can be displaced in the longitudinal direction during the printing operation, in which case it is unwound from the one winding device and wound onto the other winding device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/08 (2006.01); B41F 9/10 (2006.01); B41F 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/109 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0602431 A1 19940622; EP 0602431 B1 20000202; AT 189424 T 20000215; CA 2111427 A1 19940617; CA 2111427 C 19990817; CZ 286937 B6 20000816; CZ 9302729 A3 19940713; DE 4242582 A1 19940623; DE 4242582 C2 19980319; FI 107900 B 20011031; FI 935631 A0 19931215; FI 935631 A 19940617; HU 214713 B 19980528; HU 9303590 D0 19940428; HU T69466 A 19950928; JP 2777968 B2 19980723; JP H06278263 A 19941004; PL 173223 B1 19980227; PL 301481 A1 19940627; US 5437227 A 19950801

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-11-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: U.E. SEBALD DRUCK UND VERLAG G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001126

2000-08-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59309944 20000309

2000-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. DR. LAZZARO MARTINI S.R.L.

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189424 T 20000215

1995-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950703

1994-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940421

1994-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL