Global Patent Index - EP 0603082 B1

EP 0603082 B1 2000-04-05 - Portable radio telephone with means for protecting its user from electromagnetic radiation

Title (en)

Portable radio telephone with means for protecting its user from electromagnetic radiation

Title (de)

Tragbares Funktelefon mit einer Anordnung zum Schützen von Benützern gegen Strahlung

Title (fr)

Radiotéléphone portable muni de moyens pour protéger l'utilisateur contre le rayonnement de cet émetteur

Publication

EP 0603082 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93403088 A

Priority

FR 9215267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0603082A1] Means of protection (6, 18) are associated with the radiating system (16) of a transmitter constituting a radio telephone (4). Their function is to reduce an interception ratio which is the proportion in which the body of the user (2) intercepts the radiation emitted (20), in order to make it possible to increase the total power of this radiation. According to the invention, they include a casing (18) dictating safety distances (33, 34, 35) between the radiating system and the body of the user. They moreover include a screen (6) absorbing this radiation. The invention applies particularly to long-range radio telephones. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 17/00; H04B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0603082 A1 19940622; EP 0603082 B1 20000405; DE 69328283 D1 20000511; DE 69328283 T2 20001130; EP 0603081 A1 19940622; FR 2699773 A1 19940624; US 5493704 A 19960220

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131216

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131218

2014-01-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20131216

2013-12-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69328283

2013-12-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69328283

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: Z124, GB

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: Z124, GB

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120607 AND 20120613

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090924 AND 20090930

2006-05-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-05-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011203

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-11-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALCATEL

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328283 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1996-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960716

1994-11-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940916

1994-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE