Global Patent Index - EP 0603883 B1

EP 0603883 B1 2000-09-20 - Tongues

Title (en)

Tongues

Title (de)

Zunge

Title (fr)

Aiguillage

Publication

EP 0603883 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93120794 A

Priority

DE 4244010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0603883A1] The invention relates to a tongue (12) with connecting rail (10) merging into the latter. In this arrangement, the tongue (12) merges unwelded and via an oblique joint (16) into the connecting rail (10). The tongue itself is secured via a mounting (14) which is fixedly joined to the connecting rail (10) indirectly or directly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0603883 A1 19940629; EP 0603883 B1 20000920; AT 196517 T 20001015; DE 4244010 A1 19940630; DE 59310104 D1 20001026; DK 0603883 T3 20001218; ES 2151497 T3 20010101; GR 3035064 T3 20010330; PT 603883 E 20010131; US 5451018 A 19950919

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131224

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131224

2014-01-01 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20131223

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59310104

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071224

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080623

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-04 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080623

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. *BWG

- Effective date: 20071231

2007-01-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-09-16 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011223

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001020

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151497 T3

2000-12-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20001227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-13 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20001213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-11-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310104 20001026

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196517 T 20001015

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961204

1999-02-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BWG BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU GESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO. K

1997-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961204

1996-08-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

1994-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940608

1994-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE