Global Patent Index - EP 0604131 B1

EP 0604131 B1 2000-05-24 - Coating method for molded resin

Title (en)

Coating method for molded resin

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beschichtung eines Kunstharz-Formkörpers

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement de résine moulée

Publication

EP 0604131 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93310217 A

Priority

JP 35743092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0604131A2] This invention provides a coating method for a molded resin that is effective for achieving satisfactory adhesion of the coating material, good contact properties; inexpensive production; and good coating appearance. The method comprises forming an electroless plating film to provide a specific surface resistance on the surface of a molded resin then applying a top coat without applying a conductive primer. The coating method of this invention is suitable for any type of molded resin, especially for a molded resin containing a polyamide resin and polyphenylene ether resin or polypropylene resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 18/24; C08J 7/04; C23C 18/20; C23C 18/31

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/04 (2006.01); B05D 3/10 (2006.01); B05D 7/02 (2006.01); C23C 18/24 (2006.01); C23C 18/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 18/24 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • EP 0604132 A2 19940629 - GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD [JP]
  • PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 57 (C - 1011) 15 December 1992 (1992-12-15)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0604131 A2 19940629; EP 0604131 A3 19951213; EP 0604131 B1 20000524; DE 69328715 D1 20000629; DE 69328715 T2 20001130; ES 2146220 T3 20000801; JP H06192842 A 19940712

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041217

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021218

2004-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040202

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-01-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011203

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146220

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69328715

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1996-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960708

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960613

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1994-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL