Global patent index - EP 0604207 B1

EP 0604207 B1 2000-06-14 - A metal halide arc discharge lamp

Title (en)

A metal halide arc discharge lamp

Title (de)

Metall-Halogen Bogen Lampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à arc à halogénure métallique

Publication

EP 0604207 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93310407 A

Priority

US 99560392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0604207A1] An arc tube (6) for a metal halide discharge lamp (2) is formed of titanium oxide doped vitreous silica. In one embodiment of the invention the doped vitreous silica is fused quartz made from a melt doped with TiO2. In a preferred embodiment, the concentration of titanium oxide in the vitreous silica is approximately 250 parts per million by weight. Metal halide discharge lamps utilizing arc tubes formed from the doped vitreous silica demonstrate improved lumen output and lumen maintenance. It is believed that arc tubes formed from the doped vitreous silica also suffer less sodium loss than arc tubes formed from conventional fused quartz. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/302 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0604207 A1 19940629; EP 0604207 B1 20000614; CA 2112063 A1 19940623; DE 69328857 D1 20000720; DE 69328857 T2 20010222

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FLOWIL INTERNATIONAL LIGHTING (HOLDING) B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FLOWIL INTERNATIONAL LIGHTING (HOLDING) B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-03-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040301

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69328857

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A METAL HALIDE ARC DISCHARGE LAMP

1995-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950510

1994-09-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940708

1994-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL