EP 0604216 A3 19951206 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE.
Title (en)
LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE.
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 34244592 A 19921222
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0604216A2] A purpose of the invention is to observe an erected image favorably in an viewing angle region where a favorable display image is observable at positions differing in viewing angle, with a single panel where a liquid crystal is oriented in a certain direction relative to a display screen. Two display images (14a, 14b) rotating mutually 180 degrees on a display panel (4) are formed, and a main body (1) can be set at either desired one of upper and lower setting positions (Pb), (Pc), and the posture of the main body (1) is changeable into two states differing in phase by 180 degrees, depending on the mode of the display images (14a, 14b). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G02F 1/13 (2006.01); G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/35 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01); H04N 5/66 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G09F 9/35 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [AX] GB 2216703 A 19891011 - NEC CORP [JP]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 113 (P - 197) 18 May 1983 (1983-05-18)
- [AX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 138 (P - 078) 2 September 1981 (1981-09-02)
- [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 669 (P - 1657) 9 December 1993 (1993-12-09)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0604216 A2 19940629; EP 0604216 A3 19951206; EP 0604216 B1 19980909; DE 69320929 D1 19981015; DE 69320929 T2 19990401; JP H06189233 A 19940708
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 93310424 A 19931222; DE 69320929 T 19931222; JP 34244592 A 19921222