Global Patent Index - EP 0604452 B2

EP 0604452 B2 2001-05-16 - ORE PELLETISATION

Title (en)

ORE PELLETISATION

Title (de)

PELLETISIERUNG VON ERZEN

Title (fr)

BOULETAGE DU MINERAI

Publication

EP 0604452 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 92916647 A

Priority

  • GB 9116698 A
  • GB 9201432 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9303189A2] In an iron ore pelletisation process in which particulate ore is mixed with particulate polymeric binder in the presence of moisture and the mixture is pelletised, the particulate binder is a blend of ionic synthetic water soluble polymer, such as a copolymer of acrylamide and sodium acrylate having intrinsic viscosity 2 to 16 dl/g, with a larger amount of a soluble natural polymer, especially guar gum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 1/244

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 1/244 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 1/244 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9303189 A2 19930218; WO 9303189 A3 19930318; AU 2380292 A 19930302; AU 669852 B2 19960627; BR 9206327 A 19950411; CA 2114438 A1 19930218; CA 2114438 C 20070227; EP 0604452 A1 19940706; EP 0604452 B1 19980415; EP 0604452 B2 20010516; GB 9116698 D0 19910918; IN 180821 B 19980321; JP H06509390 A 19941020; MX 9204512 A 19930401

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080804

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2004-07-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-09-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS WATER TREATMENTS LIMITED

2001-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-05-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): NL SE

1999-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: S.N.F.

1999-03-24 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER

- Owner name: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS WATER TREATMENTS LIMITED

1999-03-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: S.N.F.

- Effective date: 19990114

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): NL SE

1996-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961018

1994-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940419

1994-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): NL SE