Global Patent Index - EP 0605262 B1

EP 0605262 B1 2000-06-28 - Process and apparatus for the production of gaseous oxygen under pressure

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the production of gaseous oxygen under pressure

Title (de)

Druckgassauerstoffherstellungsverfahren und Apparat

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de production d'oxygène gazeux sous pression

Publication

EP 0605262 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93402665 A

Priority

FR 9215925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0605262A1] According to this process, which employs a double air distillation column (5): - the low-pressure column (7) is operated under a pressure which is markedly greater than atmospheric pressure, in particular of the order of from 2 to 5 bar, and the medium-pressure column (6) is operated under a corresponding pressure, in particular of the order of from 8 to 16 bar; - the production gaseous oxygen is directly recovered in the tank of the low-pressure column, and - the apparatus is kept cold, at least partly, by free expansion of at least one gaseous product leaving the low-pressure column. Application to the production of gaseous oxygen under a pressure of a few bar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/042 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04157 (2013.01); F25J 3/04248 (2013.01); F25J 3/04254 (2013.01); F25J 3/0426 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/0486 (2013.01); F25J 3/0489 (2013.01); F25J 3/04945 (2013.01); F25J 2200/20 (2013.01); F25J 2210/42 (2013.01); F25J 2210/50 (2013.01); F25J 2235/42 (2013.01); F25J 2235/50 (2013.01); F25J 2240/44 (2013.01); F25J 2245/50 (2013.01); F25J 2270/90 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01); Y10S 62/913 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0605262 A1 19940706; EP 0605262 B1 20000628; CA 2112499 A1 19940701; DE 69328922 D1 20000803; DE 69328922 T2 20001116; FR 2699992 A1 19940701; FR 2699992 B1 19950210; JP H06229668 A 19940819; US 5408831 A 19950425

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020919

2003-02-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20020919

2002-04-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328922 20000803

2000-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950919

1995-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950919

1994-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931109

1994-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE