Global patent index - EP 0605278 B1

EP 0605278 B1 2000-02-02 - Nozzle and cutting torch

Title (en)

Nozzle and cutting torch

Title (de)

Düse und Schneidbrenner

Title (fr)

Buse et chalumeau d'oxycoupage

Publication

EP 0605278 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93403047 A

Priority

FR 9215823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0605278A1] The nozzle (8) consists of a concentric assembly of a central insert (9) which can be interchanged with ease, an intermediate insert (10) and a peripheral mounting unit (11). The intermediate insert (10) internally and externally defines rings of ducts for internal (40) and external (50) heating, which emerge around the profiled central cutting-oxygen duct (12) formed in the central insert (9), and it includes, at its rear end, at least two concentric transverse annular bearing zones (15, 16) which interact, when assembled, bearing in a leaktight manner with one transverse annular end face (5) in the torch body (1) onto which the nozzle (8) is attached. Application in particular to hot oxygen cutting or cold splitting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0605278 A1 19940706; EP 0605278 B1 20000202; DE 69327782 D1 20000309; DE 69327782 T2 20000727; ES 2144449 T3 20000616; FR 2699989 A1 19940701; FR 2699989 B1 19950127

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021217

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021217

2001-12-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144449

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69327782

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT

1996-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960503

1994-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19931220

1994-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT