Global patent index - EP 0605387 B1

EP 0605387 B1 2001-03-14 - Method for impregnating ink absorbing means in an ink tank

Title (en)

Method for impregnating ink absorbing means in an ink tank

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Imprägnieren eines Tintenabsorbers in einem Tintenbehälter

Title (fr)

Procédé d'imprégnation d'absorbeurs d'encre dans un réservoir d'encre

Publication

EP 0605387 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94101082 A

Priority

  • EP 90201873 A
  • EP 84306887 A
  • JP 10284184 A
  • JP 10284384 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0398453A2] A dot matrix printer head comprising an ink supply tank (2 sec ) containing ink absorbing means (60 sec ), the ink supply tank (2 sec ) having an ink supply port (41) which is arranged to receive ink from the ink absorbing means (60 sec ), characterised in that the ink absorbing means (60 sec ) is compressed in the vicinity of the ink supply port (41).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/255; B41J 2/305; B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/255 (2006.01); B41J 2/305 (2006.01); B41J 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/255 (2013.01); B41J 2/305 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0398453 A2 19901122; EP 0398453 A3 19901219; EP 0398453 B1 19940817; DE 3486334 C5 20060126; DE 3486334 D1 19940915; DE 3486334 T2 19950216; DE 3486335 D1 19940915; DE 3486335 T2 19950216; DE 3486337 D1 19940922; DE 3486337 T2 19950216; DE 3486480 D1 20010419; DE 3486480 T2 20011108; DE 3486481 D1 20010419; DE 3486481 T2 20011108; DE 3486482 D1 20010419; DE 3486482 T2 20011108; DE 3486483 D1 20010419; DE 3486483 T2 20011108; DE 3486485 D1 20010419; DE 3486485 T2 20011108; DE 3486487 D1 20010419; DE 3486487 T2 20011108; EP 0406982 A2 19910109; EP 0406982 A3 19910116; EP 0406982 B1 19940810; EP 0406983 A2 19910109; EP 0406983 A3 19910116; EP 0406983 B1 19940810; EP 0605386 A2 19940706; EP 0605386 A3 19940727; EP 0605386 B1 20010314; EP 0605387 A2 19940706; EP 0605387 A3 19940803; EP 0605387 B1 20010314; EP 0605388 A2 19940706; EP 0605388 A3 19940727; EP 0605388 B1 20010314; EP 0605389 A2 19940706; EP 0605389 A3 19940727; EP 0605389 B1 20010314; EP 0614761 A1 19940914; EP 0614761 B1 20010314; EP 0615848 A1 19940921; EP 0615848 B1 20010314; EP 0749839 A2 19961227; EP 0749839 A3 19970326; HK 73295 A 19950519; HK 73395 A 19950519; HK 73495 A 19950519; SG 26403 G 19950901; SG 26404 G 19950901; SG 26412 G 19950901; SG 46589 A1 19980220; SG 52578 A1 19980928; SG 54266 A1 19981116; SG 64344 A1 19990427

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20051220

2004-12-01 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV7

- Effective date: 20041009

2004-11-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

2004-10-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20041009

2004-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20041008

2003-10-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

2002-02-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 3486481

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-03-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 139508

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-03-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 406982

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41J 2/255 A, 7B 41J 2/305 B, 7B 41J 2/175 B

2000-08-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING INK ABSORBING MEANS IN AN INK TANK

1996-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960124

1994-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1994-07-27 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: B41J 3/12

1994-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940125

1994-07-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 406982

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1994-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL