Global Patent Index - EP 0605880 B2

EP 0605880 B2 2000-11-15 - Blister package for articles

Title (en)

Blister package for articles

Title (de)

Blisterpackung für Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Emballage de type blister pour articles

Publication

EP 0605880 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93120987 A

Priority

DE 9300149 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0605880A2] In order to hold even articles which are complicated in terms of shape satisfactorily and without separation in a package, said package being producible with little expenditure, it is proposed to improve a package 1 for articles 2, consisting of interconnected parts between which the article 2 is arranged, and the one part being a plastic film 6' provided with a receiving pocket for surrounding the article 2, in such a way that the first part is a flat, shaped plastic film, and that the second part is a plastic film 6' which is provided with a bulge corresponding precisely to the outer surface contour of the product to be packaged. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/36; A45D 27/22; B65D 75/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 27/29 (2006.01); B65D 75/36 (2006.01); B65D 75/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 27/29 (2013.01); B65D 75/36 (2013.01); B65D 75/366 (2013.01); B65D 75/54 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9300149 U1 19940519; EP 0605880 A2 19940713; EP 0605880 A3 19950419; EP 0605880 B1 19980603; EP 0605880 B2 20001115; JP H06278769 A 19941004; US 5429241 A 19950704

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031228

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031228

2002-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021104

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE GILLETTE COMPANY

- Effective date: 19990303

1998-11-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1998-09-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-07-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59308644 19980709

1998-06-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19980603

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-06-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19980603

1998-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980603

1998-06-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980603

1998-06-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980603

1995-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950622

1995-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950311

1995-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1994-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL