Global patent index - EP 0606073 B2

EP 0606073 B2 2000-10-04 - Bottle crate

Title (en)

Bottle crate

Title (de)

Flaschenkasten

Title (fr)

Casier à bouteilles

Publication

EP 0606073 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94100081 A

Priority

DE 4300302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0606073A2] The invention relates to a bottle crate having lateral openings. It consists in the fact that at least one lateral opening is of such a size that a bottle (5) standing in the bottle crate can be removed through this opening (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/243 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24019 (2013.01); B65D 2501/2407 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24095 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24261 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24305 (2013.01); B65D 2501/2435 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24522 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24535 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24585 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24961 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4300302 A1 19940714; AT 142581 T 19960915; EP 0606073 A2 19940713; EP 0606073 A3 19950503; EP 0606073 B1 19960911; EP 0606073 B2 20001004

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-03-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-10-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-09-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BEROLINA KUNSTSTOFF-GESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO. VERPACK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

1999-04-07 [29U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 29U

- Effective date: 19981201

1999-04-07 [29W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 29W

- Effective date: 19990728

1997-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

1997-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHOELLER-PLAST SA

- Effective date: 19970611

1997-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 19960911

1997-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

1997-02-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

1997-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970131

1997-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970131

1997-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970131

1997-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970131

1997-01-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970105

1996-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59400605

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-10-17

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

1996-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-09-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 142581

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1996-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEROLINA KUNSTSTOFF-GESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO. VERPACK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950711

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950613

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

1994-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL