Global Patent Index - EP 0606520 B1

EP 0606520 B1 2000-09-06 - Method of implementing intonation curves for vocal messages, and speech synthesis method and system using the same

Title (en)

Method of implementing intonation curves for vocal messages, and speech synthesis method and system using the same

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Realisierung von Tonkurven für Sprachnachrichten und Verfahren zur Sprachsynthese und Einrichtung zu seiner Anwendung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour réaliser des courbes d'intonation pour des messages vocaux et méthode de synthèse du langage et système utilisant celles-ci

Publication

EP 0606520 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93106692 A

Priority

IT MI930044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0606520A2] The present invention refers to a method of implementing intonation curves for vocal messages, and to a speech synthesis method and system using the same. Such methods characterize in that the generation of the pronunciation and of the intonation are carried out independently and separately using a coding technique that permits the instantaneous control of intonation, i.e. of pitch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 13/02; G10L 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/00 (2006.01); G10L 13/10 (2013.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G01L (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0606520 A2 19940720; EP 0606520 A3 19941228; EP 0606520 B1 20000906; AT 196210 T 20000915; DE 69329375 D1 20001012; DE 69329375 T2 20010315; ES 2149789 T3 20001116; IT 1263756 B 19960829; IT MI930044 A1 19940716; IT MI930044 D0 19930115

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-22 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140717

2013-12-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131114 AND 20131120

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130425

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130425

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130423

2013-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130724

2013-05-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130423

2013-04-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69329375

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120507

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149789 T3

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BORSANO CORRADO

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329375 20001012

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196210 T 20000915

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 13/02 A, 7G 10L 13/08 B

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980921

1995-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950223

1994-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1994-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE