Global Patent Index - EP 0607054 B1

EP 0607054 B1 2002-11-20 - Novel chemokine produced by hematopoietic cells and DNA encoding said chemokine

Title (en)

Novel chemokine produced by hematopoietic cells and DNA encoding said chemokine

Title (de)

Neues Chemokine von hematopoietischen Zellen produziert und die dafür kodierende DNA

Title (fr)

Nouvelle chemokine produit par des cellules hématopoiétiques et ADN codant pour celle-ci

Publication

EP 0607054 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94300267 A

Priority

JP 2209893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0607054A2] A process for constructing a cDNA library which has a selectivity for signal peptides, that makes it possible to efficiently identify unknown and useful polypeptide comprising a signal peptide. A novel polypeptide consisting of 89 amino acids (including a signal peptide) produced by a stroma cell line, which is useful as an agent for preventing or treating, for example, anemia, leukopenia or infections and the like, and DNAs coding for said polypeptide, have been identified using the process of the invention. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/19; C07K 14/52; C07K 16/24; C12N 15/62; C12N 15/85; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/53 (2006.01); C07K 14/535 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/11 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12R 1/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1051 (2013.01); C07K 14/475 (2013.01); C07K 14/70567 (2013.01); C07K 14/715 (2013.01); C12N 15/1093 (2013.01); C12N 15/1096 (2013.01); C12N 15/625 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6853 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/02 (2013.01); C07K 2319/75 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0607054 A2 19940720; EP 0607054 A3 19950208; EP 0607054 B1 20021120; AT 228163 T 20021215; AT 359366 T 20070515; CA 2113363 A1 19940715; CA 2113363 C 20030107; CA 2381458 A1 19940715; DE 69431736 D1 20030102; DE 69431736 T2 20030703; DE 69434953 D1 20070524; DK 0607054 T3 20030317; EP 1243650 A2 20020925; EP 1243650 A3 20021002; EP 1243650 B1 20070411; ES 2187516 T3 20030616; JP 2879303 B2 19990405; JP 3229590 B2 20011119; JP H06315380 A 19941115; JP H11308993 A 19991109; KR 100271725 B1 20001201; PT 607054 E 20030430; US 5525486 A 19960611

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070109

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-20 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2007-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-08-16 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20070806

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-08 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-08-08 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070329

2007-03-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070115

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070115

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-12 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-12 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070104

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-18 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CAMBRIDGE ANTIBODY TECHNOLOGY LIMITED MI

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CAMBRIDGE ANTIBODY TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187516 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400551

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431736 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228163 T 20021215

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 12N 15/62 B, 7C 12N 15/85 B, 7C 07K 14/52 B, 7C 07K 16/24 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7A 61K 38/19 B

2002-03-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NOVEL CHEMOKINE PRODUCED BY HEMATOPOIETIC CELLS AND DNA ENCODING SAID CHEMOKINE

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990621

1995-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950717

1995-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1994-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE