Global Patent Index - EP 0607184 B1

EP 0607184 B1 2000-02-09 - IMAGINOGRAPH

Title (en)

IMAGINOGRAPH

Title (de)

IMAGINOGRAPH

Title (fr)

IMAGINOGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 0607184 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92919751 A

Priority

  • GB 9121418 A
  • GB 9201734 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5556184A] PCT No. PCT/GB92/01734 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 11, 1994 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 11, 1994 PCT Filed Sep. 21, 1992 PCT Pub. No. WO93/07532 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 15, 1993Imaginograph is an image on a screen which is mathematically generalized optical illusion to create psychological three dimensionality. These pictures are the would be "merged images in the brain" produced outside the brain. Rather than creating one picture for the left eye and another for the right, an Imaginograph is already the result of the analyzed signals. Using the property that when one is looking at a flat picture, the brain superimposes the two substantially same images in the left and right eyes and produces the same picture in the brain, Imaginographs are pictures which are formed by superimposing the left and right eye views at the same position as the object of interest in the view, keeping the images of the object of interest in the two pictures in register at all times. The left and right eye views and their projections can be generalized to obtain three dimensional views of non-Euclidean spaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/22 (2006.01); G03B 35/08 (2006.01); H04N 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 13/0278 (2013.01); G02B 27/22 (2013.01); H04N 13/0014 (2013.01); H04N 13/0429 (2013.01); H04N 13/0445 (2013.01); H04N 13/0468 (2013.01); H04N 13/004 (2013.01); H04N 13/0239 (2013.01); H04N 13/0289 (2013.01); H04N 13/0431 (2013.01); H04N 13/0434 (2013.01); H04N 13/0484 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0256915 A1 19880224 - AEROSPATIALE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5556184 A 19960917; AU 2586192 A 19930503; CA 2120761 A1 19930415; CA 2120761 C 20021126; DE 69230668 D1 20000316; DE 69230668 T2 20001026; EP 0607184 A1 19940727; EP 0607184 B1 20000209; GB 9121418 D0 19911120; JP H06511570 A 19941222; WO 9307532 A1 19930415

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070921

2006-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230668 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-02-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

1995-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951016

1994-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940415

1994-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE