Global Patent Index - EP 0607438 B9

EP 0607438 B9 2001-03-21 - SWITCH DEVICE AND ITS WIRING STRUCTURE

Title (en)

SWITCH DEVICE AND ITS WIRING STRUCTURE

Title (de)

SCHALTEINRICHTUNG UND IHRE VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF COMMUTATEUR ET SA STRUCTURE DE CABLAGE

Publication

EP 0607438 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 92919638 A

Priority

  • JP 9201159 W
  • JP 23063391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0607438A1] A switch device equipped with a sensor for confirming the operation of an ejector, sensing the existence of an article transferred by a suction pad or for confirming suction of a transferred article; and a wiring structure between a control device connected to this switch device and the sensor. In this switch device, a setting unit including control means and display means and a main body unit are detachably constructed so that the switch device itself can be made small in size and light in weight. In the wiring structure between the control device and the sensor, wiring can be simplified and the possibility of wrong wiring can be eliminated by omitting a power supply line for the sensor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 19/00; H01H 35/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/00 (2006.01); G05B 19/418 (2006.01); H01H 35/24 (2006.01); H05K 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/4185 (2013.01); H01H 35/24 (2013.01); H05K 7/14 (2013.01); G05B 2219/31114 (2013.01); G05B 2219/31152 (2013.01); G05B 2219/33202 (2013.01); Y02P 90/18 (2015.11); Y10T 307/74 (2015.04); Y10T 307/779 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0607438 A1 19940727; EP 0607438 A4 19960207; EP 0607438 B1 19990609; EP 0607438 B9 20010321; DE 69229398 D1 19990715; DE 69229398 T2 20000323; JP H0573795 A 19930326; US 5604386 A 19970218; WO 9305491 A1 19930318

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2000-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

1999-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69229398 19990715

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971201

1996-02-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19951222

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE

1994-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940309

1994-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE