Global Patent Index - EP 0607449 B1

EP 0607449 B1 2000-08-23 - EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION AND PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION AND PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

SPRENGSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION EXPLOSIVE ET SA PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0607449 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93913524 A

Priority

  • JP 9300802 W
  • JP 17894092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9325500A1] An explosive composition comprising an explosive component adsorbed on the surface of minute hollow organic particles and between the hollow particles themselves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 47/14; C06B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 23/00 (2006.01); C06B 47/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 47/14 (2013.01); C06B 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9325500 A1 19931223; AU 4356293 A 19940104; AU 657629 B2 19950316; CA 2115660 A1 19931223; CA 2115660 C 19980623; DE 69329271 D1 20000928; DE 69329271 T2 20010315; EP 0607449 A1 19940727; EP 0607449 A4 19941214; EP 0607449 B1 20000823; ES 2148232 T3 20001016; KR 970004708 B1 19970402; TW 238296 B 19950111; ZA 9304244 B 19940112

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050616

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050615

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-06-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148232 T3

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329271 20000928

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1995-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950309

1994-12-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19941027

1994-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1994-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940214

1994-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE