Global patent index - EP 0608168 B2

EP 0608168 B2 2001-01-24 - Image conversion tube and method of producing such a tube

Title (en)

Image conversion tube and method of producing such a tube

Title (de)

Bildwandlerröhre und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Röhre

Title (fr)

Tube convertisseur d'images, et procédé de fabrication d'un tel tube

Publication

EP 0608168 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 94400099 A

Priority

FR 9300638 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0608168A1] The invention consists of an improvement to image converter tubes which convert the X-ray image (5) supplied on their input screen (3) into a visible image (9). Parasitic glows are developed on the insulators (11, 12, 13) inside these tubes, and the invention makes it possible to suppress these glows by depositing on the insulators a thin layer (14) of a product such as diamond carbon which has a low secondary electron emission ratio. Metal oxides are also suitable. Application to image intensifier tubes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/18 (2006.01); H01J 9/20 (2006.01); H01J 29/82 (2006.01); H01J 29/88 (2006.01); H01J 31/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 31/501 (2013.01); H01J 2231/50036 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0608168 A1 19940727; EP 0608168 B1 19970312; EP 0608168 B2 20010124; DE 69401966 D1 19970417; DE 69401966 T2 19970626; DE 69401966 T3 20010523; FR 2700889 A1 19940729; FR 2700889 B1 19950224; JP 3529152 B2 20040524; JP H06243806 A 19940902; US 6147446 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-10-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110916

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100801

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2001-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2001-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2001-01-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

1998-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG

1998-02-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG

- Effective date: 19971212

1997-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69401966

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-04-17

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

1996-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960709

1995-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941126

1994-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL