Global Patent Index - EP 0608525 B2

EP 0608525 B2 2000-03-29 - Process for the preparation of a milk composition

Title (en)

Process for the preparation of a milk composition

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von einer Milchzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'une composition laitière

Publication

EP 0608525 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 93119911 A

Priority

  • EP 93119911 A
  • CH 397192 A
  • EP 93810367 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5503865A] A dairy composition is prepared by ultrafiltering or microfiltering a skimmed milk to obtain a retentate having a skimmed milk/retentate volume ratio of from 3-6 and by mixing lactose with the retentate to provide a composition having nonfat dry matter solids in an amount of from 20% to 30% by weight and which has by weight, based upon a weight of non-fat solids in the composition, from 33% to 36% protein, from 48% to 58% lactose and from 3% to 5% minerals, wherein the calcium content is from 75% to 100% that of the milk, a phosphorous content is from 50% to 75% that of the milk, a sodium content is from 5% to 20% that of the milk, a potassium content is from 5% to 20% that of the milk, and a citrate content is from 10% to 30% that of the milk.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23C 9/142; A23C 9/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23C 23/00 (2006.01); A23C 9/142 (2006.01); A23C 9/15 (2006.01); A23C 9/152 (2006.01); A23C 9/18 (2006.01); A23C 11/04 (2006.01); A23L 1/305 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23C 11/04 (2013.01); A23C 9/1422 (2013.01); A23C 9/1512 (2013.01); A23L 33/19 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5503865 A 19960402; AT 149288 T 19970315; AU 5228093 A 19940707; AU 661215 B2 19950713; BR 9305238 A 19940705; CA 2111179 A1 19940629; CA 2111179 C 20030812; CN 1052615 C 20000524; CN 1089778 A 19940727; CO 4560537 A1 19980210; DE 69308529 D1 19970410; DE 69308529 T2 19970612; DE 69308529 T3 20000824; DK 0608525 T3 19970825; DK 0608525 T4 20000306; EP 0608525 A1 19940803; EP 0608525 B1 19970305; EP 0608525 B2 20000329; ES 2098640 T3 19970501; ES 2098640 T5 20000616; FI 111325 B 20030715; FI 935665 A0 19931216; FI 935665 A 19940629; GR 3023387 T3 19970829; GR 3033406 T3 20000929; HK 1006504 A1 19990305; JP 3638301 B2 20050413; JP H06217689 A 19940809; NO 314431 B1 20030324; NO 934772 A 19940629; NO 934772 D0 19931222; NZ 250399 A 19940927; RU 2109456 C1 19980427; US 5639502 A 19970617

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071211

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071211

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071211

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080611

2008-09-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-08-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. DES PRODUITS *NESTLE S.A.

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-06-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080611

2007-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20061211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061208

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061203

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-13 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-06-05 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-06-05 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-04-19 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-04-14 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-03-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-06 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

1999-11-17 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A MILK COMPOSITION

1998-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ALPI MILCHVEARBEITUNGS- UND HANDELS GMBH

1998-01-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALPI MILCHVEARBEITUNGS- UND HANDELS GMBH

- Effective date: 19971203

1997-12-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971210

1997-08-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1997-07-31 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Free text: 3023387

1997-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970609

1997-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19970408

1997-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

1997-05-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: 72360

1997-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2098640 T3

1997-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69308529 19970410

1997-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1997-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 149288 T 19970315

1996-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960301

1994-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931210

1994-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE