Global Patent Index - EP 0608937 B1

EP 0608937 B1 2000-04-12 - Audio signal processing arrangement for deriving a centre channel signal and also an audio visual reproduction system comprising such a processing arrangement

Title (en)

Audio signal processing arrangement for deriving a centre channel signal and also an audio visual reproduction system comprising such a processing arrangement

Title (de)

Tonsignalverarbeitungsanordnung zur Ableitung eines Mittelkanalsignals und audiovisuelles Wiedergabesystem mit solcher Verarbeitungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement de signaux audio pour dériver un signal de canal central et système de reproduction audiovisuelle comprenant un tel dispositif de traitement

Publication

EP 0608937 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94200122 A

Priority

  • EP 94200122 A
  • EP 93200208 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0608937A1] The disclosed arrangement comprises a first filter (20) for splitting off signal components from the left channel signal (L) at least within one frequency band. Signal components are split off from the right channel signal (R) by a second filter (23). The output signals of the filters (20 and 23) are compared with the right channel signal (R) and the left channel signal (L) respectively. The filter parameters of the filters (20 and 23) are adjusted to values at which there is maximum correlation between the compared signals according to a given criterion. The centre channel signal is derived in dependence on the filter adjustment. This can be effected by combining the output signals of the filters (20 and 23). In this manner a centre channel signal is obtained formed by the correlating left and right channel signal components, so that the stereo image is hardly disturbed by the addition of the centre channel signal, whereas the perceived position of the virtual sources in the stereo image becomes less dependent on the listener's position with respect to the left and right loudspeakers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 3/00; H04S 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04S 3/00 (2006.01); H04S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 5/00 (2013.01); H04S 2400/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0608937 A1 19940803; EP 0608937 B1 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-22 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-10-16 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423922 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990426

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1995-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950203

1994-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN

1994-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB