Global Patent Index - EP 0609121 B1

EP 0609121 B1 2000-09-20 - Solid washing composition containing at least one biodegradable and non-hygroscopic polycarboxylic polymer

Title (en)

Solid washing composition containing at least one biodegradable and non-hygroscopic polycarboxylic polymer

Title (de)

Mindestens ein biologisch abbaubares und nicht-hygroskopisches Polycarbonsäurepolymer enthaltende feste Reinigungszusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition détergente solide contenant au moins un polymère polycarboxylique biodégradable et non hygroscopique

Publication

EP 0609121 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94400134 A

Priority

FR 9300776 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0609121A1] The present invention relates to a solid detergent composition containing at least one biodegradable polycarboxylic (polycarboxyl) polymer, characterised in that the said polymer is present therein either: - partially or completely in the form of one of its non-water-soluble inorganic salts or - in the form of a mixed water-soluble/non-water-soluble salt, the said corresponding polycarboxylic polymer possessing a substantially non-hygroscopic nature compatible with prolonged storage in the said detergent formulation. The present invention also relates to the uses of the said composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/223 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 3/3715 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4428749 A 19840131 - MORRIS RONALD M [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0609121 A1 19940803; EP 0609121 B1 20000920; AT 196499 T 20001015; AU 5399294 A 19940804; AU 668001 B2 19960418; BR 9400369 A 19940816; CA 2114382 A1 19940728; CA 2114382 C 20010703; DE 69425915 D1 20001026; DE 69425915 T2 20010419; ES 2152296 T3 20010201; FR 2700775 A1 19940729; FR 2700775 B1 19950310; JP 2594882 B2 19970326; JP H0748596 A 19950221; NZ 250756 A 19960326; PT 609121 E 20010330; US 5520842 A 19960528

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050131

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20050725

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-08-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-07-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050725

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-01-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-01-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-04-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040409

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-02-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152296 T3

2001-01-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-12-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425915 20001026

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196499 T 20001015

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990122

1998-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHODIA CHIMIE

1994-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940127

1994-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE