Global Patent Index - EP 0609682 B1

EP 0609682 B1 2001-03-28 - Oxidation- and corrosion-resistant alloy based on doped iron aluminide and application of this alloy

Title (en)

Oxidation- and corrosion-resistant alloy based on doped iron aluminide and application of this alloy

Title (de)

Oxidations- und korrosionsbeständige Legierung auf der Basis von dotiertem Eisenaluminid und Verwendung dieser Legierung

Title (fr)

Alliage résistant à l'oxydation et à la corrosion, à base l'aluminiure de fer dopé et application de cet alliage

Publication

EP 0609682 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94100485 A

Priority

DE 4303316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0609682A1] The alloy is based on doped iron aluminide Fe3Al. It contains the following alloy constituents, in atomic per cent: 24 - 28 of aluminium 0.1 - 2 of niobium, tantalum and/or tungsten 0.1 - 10 of chromium 0.1 - 2 of silicon 0.1 - 5 of boron 0.01 - 2 of titanium the remainder being iron. The alloy is distinguished, even at temperatures above 700@C, by a high oxidation resistance and corrosion resistance and is preferentially used in components which are exposed to oxidising and corroding effects at high temperatures and low mechanical stress. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0609682 A1 19940810; EP 0609682 B1 20010328; AT 200111 T 20010415; DE 4303316 A1 19940811; JP 3420815 B2 20030630; JP H06240415 A 19940830; US 5422070 A 19950606

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100114

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-08-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-01-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-01-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040105

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040102

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-06-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409701 20010503

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200111 T 20010415

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000519

1997-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

1995-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950118

1994-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE